U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cv-05068
  • Case Name: Lamar Advertising of South Dakota, Inc et al v. City of Rapid City
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 21, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 18, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 12, 2016: [Transcript]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 10, 2015: [Objection]
  • November 09, 2015: [Request]
  • November 04, 2015: [Request]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 28, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 27, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • October 27, 2015: [Bill of Costs]
  • October 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2015: [Costs]
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order]
  • September 29, 2015: [Judgment]
August, 2014
  • August 06, 2014: [Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.