U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cv-04182
  • Case Name: O'Neal v. Remington Arms Company, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continue]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2016: [Continue]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Response]
  • February 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Received]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 21, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 02, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [USCA Order]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 14, 2015: [USCA Opinion]
August, 2014
  • August 07, 2014: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.