U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cv-05009
  • Case Name: Hunt v. Rowenhorst et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 16, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
August, 2014
  • August 07, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.