U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cv-05075
  • Case Name: Vore v. Osborn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 21, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 21, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Objections to Deposition Designations]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • September 28, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 28, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 28, 2016: [In Limine]
  • September 28, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • September 28, 2016: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 17, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • June 16, 2015: [Response]
  • June 16, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2014
  • August 07, 2014: [Extend Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.