U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04124
  • Case Name: Janvrin v. Continental Resources, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 20, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • September 11, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 20, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 25, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 19, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 01, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 28, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 22, 2017: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
  • February 21, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • February 21, 2017: [Response]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 06, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • February 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law]
  • January 13, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 13, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • January 13, 2017: [Verdict]
  • January 13, 2017: [Response]
  • January 13, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • January 13, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 13, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 11, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
  • January 11, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • January 10, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 10, 2017: [Jury List]
  • January 10, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • January 09, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 06, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 06, 2017: [Response]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 06, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 05, 2017: [Return of Service Executed]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 03, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 03, 2017: [Jury List]
  • January 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 30, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 30, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 29, 2016: [Brief]
  • December 29, 2016: [Strike]
  • December 27, 2016: [Response]
  • December 23, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 23, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 23, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 23, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • December 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 16, 2016: [In Limine]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Reply]
  • August 09, 2016: [Brief]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 05, 2016: [In Limine]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 11, 2015: [Response]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 13, 2015: [Proposed Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Extend]
  • November 12, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 12, 2015: [Response]
  • November 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 20, 2015: [Continue]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2014
  • August 11, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.