U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cv-05008
  • Case Name: Davis v. Crescent Electric Supply Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 27, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Extend]
  • October 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Objection]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 07, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • October 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2016: [Objection]
  • October 05, 2016: [Response]
  • October 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • October 03, 2016: [In Limine]
  • October 03, 2016: [Certificate]
  • October 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Compel]
  • October 03, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 03, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 01, 2016: [Response]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 21, 2016: [Leave to]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Brief]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Response]
  • May 17, 2016: [Response]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order]
  • May 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2016: [Extend]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 28, 2015: [Expedite]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order Referring Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • September 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 14, 2015: [Response to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Reply]
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 24, 2015: [Compel]
  • August 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 24, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 24, 2015: [Certificate]
  • August 03, 2015: [Reply]
  • August 03, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 20, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2015: [Proposed Order]
  • July 06, 2015: [Sanctions]
  • July 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 01, 2015: [Supplement]
August, 2014
  • August 15, 2014: [Dismiss Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.