U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cv-03026
  • Case Name: Mortensbak v. Butler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 19, 2015: [USCA Order]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • August 03, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [USCA Order]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 26, 2015: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • June 26, 2015: [USCA Order (Limited Remand)]
  • June 24, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 23, 2015: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 12, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 12, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
August, 2014
  • August 19, 2014: [Produce]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.