U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cv-03013
  • Case Name: Oliver v. County of Gregory et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 25, 2016: [Strike]
  • February 24, 2016: [Brief]
  • February 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 17, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Brief]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 05, 2016: [Leave to]
  • February 04, 2016: [Brief]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Transcript]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 20, 2016: [Briefing Schedule]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Supplement]
  • November 18, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 10, 2015: [Reply]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 26, 2015: [Strike]
  • October 26, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 26, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 26, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 26, 2015: [Objection]
  • October 22, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 16, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 12, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [File Excess Pages]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Response]
  • August 28, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • August 17, 2015: [Statement]
  • August 17, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 17, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • August 17, 2015: [Brief]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 17, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • July 17, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2014
  • August 29, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.