U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05056
  • Case Name: Knudtson v. U.S. Department of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 13, 2015: [Declaration]
  • November 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 13, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 13, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Extend]
  • September 01, 2015: [Proposed Order]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2014
  • August 29, 2014: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.