U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04138
  • Case Name: Schaffer et al v. Beringer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Received]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • November 21, 2016: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Letter Sent]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 22, 2015: [Redacted Document]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 22, 2015: [Costs Taxed]
  • October 21, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 01, 2015: [Bill of Costs]
September, 2014
  • September 04, 2014: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.