U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04144
  • Case Name: Oskar v. The United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 10, 2017: [Brief]
  • May 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Declaration]
  • April 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 21, 2017: [Exclude]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Designation of Expert Witness]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 21, 2016: [Reply]
  • January 08, 2016: [Statement]
  • January 08, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 08, 2016: [Brief]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Text Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • August 06, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 06, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 06, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
September, 2014
  • September 11, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.