U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:04-cv-04153
  • Case Name: Dale v. Slyhuis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • December 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 08, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
September, 2014
  • September 12, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.