U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04140
  • Case Name: Olson v. Lortz
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 28, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
  • February 02, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 26, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 15, 2018: [Extend]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 20, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 01, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 30, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 30, 2017: [Exclude]
  • November 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 30, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 19, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 06, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 06, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 13, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Withdraw]
  • September 23, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 09, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 09, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 09, 2016: [Exclude]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2016: [Substitute Party]
  • April 01, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Notice]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 08, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 16, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2014
  • September 17, 2014: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.