U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05059
  • Case Name: Poor Bear et al v. The County of Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 08, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 11, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 29, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • March 17, 2016: [Admission]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 18, 2016: [Response]
  • February 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 16, 2016: [Extend]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 22, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 22, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 22, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 14, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 14, 2016: [Response]
  • January 08, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 29, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 24, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 24, 2015: [Statement]
  • December 24, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 22, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2015: [Text Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Dismiss]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 05, 2015: [PHV Fee Paid]
  • August 05, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2014
  • September 18, 2014: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.