U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cv-05048
  • Case Name: Traversie v. Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • October 17, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • October 02, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Appeal Record Returned]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 05, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • November 18, 2015: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 18, 2015: [Transcript]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 17, 2015: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • November 17, 2015: [Transcript]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [USCA Order]
September, 2014
  • September 20, 2014: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.