U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cv-05068
  • Case Name: Salway v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Letter Sent]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 06, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • May 06, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • May 06, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 02, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 20, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • April 20, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 20, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 21, 2016: [Letter Received]
September, 2014
  • September 22, 2014: [Report and Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.