U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cv-05012
  • Case Name: Soltesz v. Rushmore Plaza Civic Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
  • October 24, 2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 26, 2017: [Letter]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 26, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 18, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 13, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 08, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 07, 2017: [Response]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [Objection]
  • August 25, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 25, 2017: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • August 14, 2017: [In Limine]
  • August 09, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 09, 2017: [Witness List]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Brief]
  • May 15, 2017: [Response]
  • May 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Brief]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • April 07, 2017: [Briefing Schedule]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 16, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 07, 2017: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 02, 2016: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • February 02, 2016: [Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 09, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 08, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • September 08, 2015: [Judgment]
September, 2014
  • September 22, 2014: [Text Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.