U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cv-04030
  • Case Name: Hansen Manufacturing Corp. v. Enduro Systems, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 11, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Status Report]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Status Report]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Status Report]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Status Report]
September, 2014
  • September 24, 2014: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.