U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-01021
  • Case Name: Mettler et al v. Ability Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order]
  • March 04, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Reply]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • February 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • February 19, 2016: [Declaration]
  • February 19, 2016: [Response]
  • February 19, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2016: [Seal Existing Document]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 29, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 29, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Extend]
  • December 08, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 08, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 08, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 08, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 08, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 25, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2015: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
September, 2014
  • September 25, 2014: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.