U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04146
  • Case Name: Lee et al v. Driscoll et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 22, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 12, 2017: [USCA Opinion]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 07, 2016: [Transcript]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 29, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Cross Appeal]
  • July 19, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 15, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 15, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2016: [Certificate]
  • January 11, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 11, 2016: [Brief]
December, 2015
  • December 24, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 24, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 24, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 24, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 24, 2015: [Exclude]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 20, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2014
  • September 25, 2014: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.