U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04147
  • Case Name: Jenner v. Nikolas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 16, 2016: [USCA Order]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [USCA Opinion]
  • July 08, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 09, 2015: [Extend]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 28, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 29, 2015: [Judgment]
September, 2014
  • September 26, 2014: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.