U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05063
  • Case Name: Lays Hard v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • May 01, 2018: [Withdraw]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 20, 2018: [Response]
  • February 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 13, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Social Security Admin Hrg Transcript]
  • December 04, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 19, 2016: [Objection]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
September, 2014
  • September 29, 2014: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.