U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cv-05083
  • Case Name: Lytle v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 05, 2015: [USCA Order]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [USCA Opinion]
  • August 24, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [USCA Order]
September, 2014
  • September 30, 2014: [Order Dismissing Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.