U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04150
  • Case Name: AT&T Corp. v. Oglala Sioux Tribe Utility Commission et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2016: [Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Status Report]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2014
  • September 30, 2014: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.