U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04151
  • Case Name: Goulding v. Kaemingk et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Received]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 17, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Response]
  • November 12, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 12, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Proposed Schedule]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Scheduling Request]
  • August 25, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 10, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2014
  • October 02, 2014: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.