U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cv-04133
  • Case Name: Thompson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • March 02, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2014
  • October 06, 2014: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.