U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cv-04090
  • Case Name: Lasley v. Running Supply, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • January 03, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 05, 2016: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • November 24, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 23, 2015: [Transcript]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 12, 2015: [Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 20, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 19, 2015: [Request]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
October, 2014
  • October 06, 2014: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.