U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cv-05043
  • Case Name: Reints v. City of Rapid City, South Dakota et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • February 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 23, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 16, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • December 16, 2019: [Response]
  • December 04, 2019: [Reply]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 18, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 12, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 04, 2019: [Response]
  • November 04, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • July 01, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 01, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Response]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 27, 2019: [Seal Existing Document]
  • May 27, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 24, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 07, 2019: [Reply]
  • May 05, 2019: [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 29, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 23, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 25, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 05, 2018: [Redacted Document]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 14, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Status Conference]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bill of Costs]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 16, 2015: [Discovery]
October, 2014
  • October 06, 2014: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.