U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cv-03026
  • Case Name: Sisseton-Wahpeton Oyate of the Lake Traverse Reservation et al v. United States Corps
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Appellees Brief]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Appellants Brief]
  • January 08, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Briefing Schedule]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Proposed Schedule]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2014
  • October 08, 2014: [Proposed Schedule]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.