U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05065
  • Case Name: Hatchett v. Young
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Letter Sent]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Appeal Record Returned]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 14, 2016: [USCA Order]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • April 20, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • April 20, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 18, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 08, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 24, 2016: [Extend]
  • March 24, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 20, 2015: [Receipt]
  • November 19, 2015: [Received]
October, 2015
  • October 02, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • August 19, 2015: [Brief]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Brief]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2015: [Response]
October, 2014
  • October 08, 2014: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.