U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04153
  • Case Name: Letch et al v. The Construction Zone, Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2016: [Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Response]
  • July 01, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 23, 2016: [Extend]
  • June 20, 2016: [Response]
  • June 20, 2016: [Reply]
  • June 20, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 16, 2016: [Reply]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 16, 2016: [Extend]
  • June 06, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Response]
  • June 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 19, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 03, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice]
  • May 03, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 02, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 02, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 05, 2015: [Certificate]
  • November 05, 2015: [Leave to]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2015: [Designation of Expert Witness]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 24, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 16, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2014
  • October 09, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.