U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05067
  • Case Name: Hopkins v. American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 03, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 08, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 27, 2017: [Compel]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 26, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2014
  • October 14, 2014: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.