U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cv-03008
  • Case Name: Stands v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2016: [Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Response]
  • December 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 17, 2015: [Discovery]
  • December 10, 2015: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2014
  • October 16, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.