U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cv-03007
  • Case Name: Running v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 31, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 07, 2016: [Affidavit]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 22, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 21, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 21, 2016: [Brief]
  • March 21, 2016: [Request for Production of Documents]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 16, 2016: [Continue]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2014
  • October 16, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.