U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:10-cv-04039
  • Case Name: Castaneira v. Midland National Life Insurance Company, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • August 22, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Hearing]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 29, 2018: [Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 03, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Objection]
  • December 15, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2017: [Received]
  • December 14, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2017: [Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Letter Received]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2014
  • October 16, 2014: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.