U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cv-05006
  • Case Name: Quick Bear v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Response]
  • February 08, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 08, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Destruction of Social Security Admin Hrg Transcript]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Response]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
  • September 04, 2015: [Judgment]
October, 2014
  • October 16, 2014: [Transcript - Social Security Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.