U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cv-04187
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Parks Huston
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice]
October, 2014
  • October 16, 2014: [Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.