U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04157
  • Case Name: Larson v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
October, 2014
  • October 20, 2014: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.