U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cv-04138
  • Case Name: Miller v. Huron Regional Medical Center, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 08, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 30, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 21, 2018: [Seal Existing Document]
  • May 02, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • May 01, 2018: [Letter Sent]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 17, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 12, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 12, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice]
  • March 21, 2018: [Bond]
  • March 09, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 07, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 07, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • February 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 10, 2017: [Transcript]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 18, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 08, 2017: [New Trial]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 02, 2017: [Transcript]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Objection]
  • May 18, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 10, 2017: [Deposition]
  • May 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 08, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 08, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 08, 2017: [Verdict]
  • May 08, 2017: [Response]
  • May 08, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • May 08, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 04, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • May 02, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 02, 2017: [Jury List]
April, 2017
  • April 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 29, 2017: [Transcript]
  • April 28, 2017: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2017: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • April 25, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 21, 2017: [Reply]
  • April 21, 2017: [Response]
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 20, 2017: [Response]
  • April 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 17, 2017: [Objection]
  • April 14, 2017: [Objection]
  • April 14, 2017: [Supplement]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 13, 2017: [Transcript]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 13, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 13, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 13, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 13, 2016: [Jury List]
  • December 13, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • December 08, 2016: [Response]
  • December 08, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 07, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 06, 2016: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • December 06, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 05, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 05, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 05, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 05, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Leave to]
  • December 02, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 02, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 01, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [In Limine]
  • November 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 11, 2016: [Protective Order]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 21, 2016: [In Limine]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Response]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 31, 2016: [Transcript]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 03, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Continue]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • April 29, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Leave to]
  • April 27, 2016: [Trial Brief]
  • April 27, 2016: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • April 25, 2016: [Response]
  • April 22, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2016: [Response]
  • April 21, 2016: [Reply]
  • April 20, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Reply]
  • April 20, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 18, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2016: [Jury List]
  • April 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 15, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 05, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2014
  • October 20, 2014: [Designation of Expert Witness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.