U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05075
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 2035 Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 31, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Response]
  • May 16, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 02, 2018: [Response]
  • May 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 06, 2018: [Transmittal of Documents]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 08, 2018: [Response]
  • January 03, 2018: [Letter Received]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 22, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 22, 2017: [Receipt]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Electronically File Documents]
  • November 01, 2017: [Electronically File Documents (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Response]
  • August 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2017: [Declaration]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Response]
  • July 03, 2017: [Response]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 26, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2017: [Response]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Response]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Strike]
  • January 19, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 19, 2016: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • December 16, 2016: [Leave to]
  • December 15, 2016: [Permanent Injunction]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Permanent Injunction]
  • November 28, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 17, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Declaration]
  • November 17, 2016: [Response]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 02, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2016: [Objection]
  • October 26, 2016: [Stay]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 24, 2016: [Compel]
  • October 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 06, 2016: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • January 11, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • January 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • January 03, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 03, 2016: [Transcript]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 14, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • December 08, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 03, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 03, 2015: [Court Reporter Information]
  • December 03, 2015: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 02, 2015: [Stay]
  • December 02, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 24, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 23, 2015: [Affidavit]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 13, 2015: [Permanent Injunction]
  • October 06, 2015: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • October 06, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • October 06, 2015: [Permanent Injunction]
  • October 05, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 02, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 28, 2015: [In Limine]
  • September 24, 2015: [Continue]
  • September 17, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [USCA Opinion]
  • August 24, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 12, 2015: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2015: [Stay]
  • August 07, 2015: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 05, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 05, 2015: [Transcript]
  • August 05, 2015: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 07, 2015: [Continue]
  • July 02, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2014
  • October 21, 2014: [Declaration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.