U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04160
  • Case Name: LeGrand v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [USCA Order]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 31, 2015: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • July 29, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
October, 2014
  • October 24, 2014: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.