U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cv-04071
  • Case Name: Planned Parenthood Minnesota, North Dakota, South Dakota et al v. Daugaard et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 20, 2022: [Joinder]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Letter (attorney use)]
  • October 17, 2022: [Joinder]
  • October 17, 2022: [Letter (attorney use)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 06, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2022: [Letter (attorney use)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • September 27, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2022: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 21, 2021: [Extend]
  • September 16, 2021: [Letter Sent]
  • September 03, 2021: [Letter Sent]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 31, 2021: [Letter (attorney use)]
  • August 26, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 25, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 24, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • August 17, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 17, 2021: [Leave to]
  • August 13, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 30, 2021: [Leave to]
  • July 23, 2021: [Declaration]
  • July 23, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extend]
  • July 02, 2021: [Declaration]
  • July 01, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 30, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 30, 2021: [Leave to]
  • June 25, 2021: [Letter (attorney use)]
  • June 16, 2021: [Declaration]
  • June 15, 2021: [Declaration]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extend]
  • June 01, 2021: [Seal Existing Document]
  • June 01, 2021: [Declaration]
  • June 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 28, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 27, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 21, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 13, 2021: [Declaration]
  • May 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2021: [Declaration]
  • May 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 26, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2021: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 15, 2021: [Expedite]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Declaration]
  • February 09, 2021: [Declaration]
  • February 09, 2021: [Request]
  • February 05, 2021: [Declaration]
  • February 05, 2021: [Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Declaration]
  • January 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 19, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 11, 2021: [Extend]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 23, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Received]
  • December 21, 2020: [Brief]
  • December 18, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2020: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 30, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 10, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 27, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 07, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 01, 2018: [Leave to]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 23, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 27, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 19, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 19, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 19, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 05, 2016: [Extend]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 01, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 31, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 31, 2016: [In Limine]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 24, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2014
  • October 28, 2014: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.