U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05076
  • Case Name: Vice v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order of Recusal]
  • November 28, 2016: [Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Letter Sent]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 01, 2015: [Letter Sent]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Request]
November, 2014
  • November 03, 2014: [Notice of Filing Error]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.