U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05071
  • Case Name: Young Bear et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 15, 2017: [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2016: [Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Objection]
  • September 08, 2016: [Leave to]
  • September 08, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 07, 2016: [Leave to]
  • September 07, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 07, 2016: [Response]
  • September 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 05, 2016: [Extend]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • July 18, 2016: [Declaration]
  • July 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 18, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 18, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 18, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Protective Order]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
November, 2014
  • November 03, 2014: [Affidavit of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.