U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cv-04214
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $27,202.74 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2016: [Mail Returned]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • December 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 28, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2015: [Certificate]
  • December 16, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 14, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2015: [Extend]
  • December 11, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 11, 2015: [Entry of Default]
  • December 11, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2015: [Response]
November, 2014
  • November 03, 2014: [Consent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.