U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cv-03030
  • Case Name: Sun Prairie, et al v. McCaleb, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Response]
  • May 23, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 23, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 23, 2016: [Response]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Extend]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order]
  • April 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Application]
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Reply]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Response]
  • December 22, 2015: [Request]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 03, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 03, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Extend]
  • November 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 20, 2015: [Extend]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 03, 2015: [Extend]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 13, 2015: [Leave to]
  • October 13, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
November, 2014
  • November 03, 2014: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.