U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04155
  • Case Name: Cody v. McDonald et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 07, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 07, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 24, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • June 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 22, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Response]
  • February 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 09, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 06, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 16, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 15, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 15, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 07, 2016: [Extend]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Response]
  • September 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Certificate]
  • July 01, 2016: [Compel]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 13, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 13, 2016: [Compel]
  • June 13, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 08, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • March 30, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [USCA Order (Limited Remand)]
  • March 29, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 24, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 24, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • March 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 10, 2015: [Extend]
  • December 02, 2015: [Extend]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 23, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • November 12, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Declaration]
  • October 15, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 15, 2015: [Response]
  • October 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Supplement]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • August 27, 2015: [Strike]
  • August 27, 2015: [Extend]
  • August 27, 2015: [More Definite Statement]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 12, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 12, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • July 22, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 01, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 22, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • June 22, 2015: [Brief]
November, 2014
  • November 04, 2014: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.