U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04165
  • Case Name: Coon v. Carpenter
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 12, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Designation of Expert Witness]
  • October 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 14, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [Extend]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Letter Received]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 22, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • October 21, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 14, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • October 07, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Objection]
  • July 10, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
November, 2014
  • November 05, 2014: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.