U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04104
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Gucci wallet et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2017: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Status Report]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 28, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 24, 2016: [Status Report]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Order Lifting Stay]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2014
  • November 06, 2014: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.