U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05080
  • Case Name: Ashley v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 11, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 29, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 29, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • January 06, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 06, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 04, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2014
  • November 12, 2014: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.